NY S06855 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2804A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2804A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of micro-business worker cooperatives upon transfer of ownership.
Title
Relates to the creation of micro-business worker cooperatives upon transfer of ownership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2804A |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1849 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6855A |
2018-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-08-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02804 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - tabled