NY S06864 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities within the state of New York to establish a senior citizen longtime resident real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes municipalities within the state of New York to establish a senior citizen longtime resident real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2017-10-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6864A |
2017-10-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-09-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02279 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.212