NY S06903 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.481
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.481
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the population limit of certain cities for purposes of requiring training of assessors of such cities.
Title
Increases the population limit of certain cities for purposes of requiring training of assessors of such cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.481 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.1011 |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a8722b |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1188 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6903B |
2018-02-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6903A |
2018-02-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-10-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08722 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - substituted by s6903b