NY S06906 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits horizontal drilling and high-volume hydraulic fracturing.
Title
Prohibits horizontal drilling and high-volume hydraulic fracturing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.347 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-12-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09678 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - advanced to third reading cal.468