NY S06907 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - PRINT NUMBER 6907A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - PRINT NUMBER 6907A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to farm worker meal and lodging minimum wage credits.
Title
Relates to farm worker meal and lodging minimum wage credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6907A |
2018-03-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-10-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08625 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - print number 8625a