NY S06939 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.433
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Erie to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Christopher J. Lysy, Kristin M. Rozycki, Marc J. Bristow, Daniel E. Walczak, Thomas Van Wie and Donald Hoelscher who are deputy sheriffs employed by such county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Erie to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Christopher J. Lysy, Kristin M. Rozycki, Marc J. Bristow, Daniel E. Walczak, Thomas Van Wie and Donald Hoelscher who are deputy sheriffs employed by such county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.433
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.176
2018-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a9540a
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1565
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-23SenatePRINT NUMBER 6939A
2018-01-23SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2017-11-08SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A09540 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - substituted by s6939a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback