NY S06943 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the date for which the New York city housing authority shall publish information on their website and the date by which a meeting shall be held to discuss proposed additions to such website.
Title
Revises the date for which the New York city housing authority shall publish information on their website and the date by which a meeting shall be held to discuss proposed additions to such website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.47 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.383 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | substituted for a9127 |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2020-01-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.22 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09127 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.47