NY S06948 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.305
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.305
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a hospital supplemental reimbursement rate adjustment for enhanced safety net hospitals.
Title
Establishes a hospital supplemental reimbursement rate adjustment for enhanced safety net hospitals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.305 |
2016-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.520 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9476a |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1966 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6948A |
2016-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2016-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09476 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s6948a