NY S06959 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - SIGNED CHAP.115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - SIGNED CHAP.115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring notice where the tentative equalization rate varies more than five percentage points from the locally stated level of assessment within ten days of reciept of such rate or filing of the tentative assessment roll.
Title
Relates to requiring notice where the tentative equalization rate varies more than five percentage points from the locally stated level of assessment within ten days of reciept of such rate or filing of the tentative assessment roll.
Sponsors
Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Elaine Phillips [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.115 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.878 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | substituted for a8805 |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-02-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.281 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-11-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08805 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - substituted by s6959