NY S06996 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates uniformed officers of the fire marshal's office of the town of Huntington as peace officers.
Title
Designates uniformed officers of the fire marshal's office of the town of Huntington as peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.189 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.455 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a9883 |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1156 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |