NY S07102 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the training requirements for prescribers of certain pain medications.
Title
Relates to the training requirements for prescribers of certain pain medications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2020-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | AMENDED 7102A |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.173 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09829 (Same As) 2020-02-19 - referred to higher education