NY S07115 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a prescription for a schedule II, III, or IV controlled substance to be partially filled at the request of the prescriber or patient.
Title
Allows a prescription for a schedule II, III, or IV controlled substance to be partially filled at the request of the prescriber or patient.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.74 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.408 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | substituted for a9034 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2020-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.174 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09034 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.74