NY S07117 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the minimum cumulative grade point average admission requirement for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs; removes the minimum 3.0 or higher requirement.
Title
Relates to the minimum cumulative grade point average admission requirement for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs; removes the minimum 3.0 or higher requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.75 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.254 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted for a9750 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.131 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09750 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.75