NY S07134 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to providing county correction officers with a special optional twenty year retirement plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to providing county correction officers with a special optional twenty year retirement plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.316
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.424
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10950
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2018-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1723
2018-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-16SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10950 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7134

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback