NY S07134 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires passengers under 16 to wear safety belts in taxis and livery vehicles.
Title
Requires passengers under 16 to wear safety belts in taxis and livery vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | signed chap.8 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.83 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7134 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.5 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | rules report cal.5 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2020-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8990 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.83 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08990 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.8