NY S07158 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.179
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.179
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the special accidental death benefit paid to a widow or widower or the deceased member's children under the age of eighteen, or if a student, under the age of twenty-three.
Title
Increases the special accidental death benefit paid to a widow or widower or the deceased member's children under the age of eighteen, or if a student, under the age of twenty-three.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.179 |
2018-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.52 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a9056a |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2018-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.526 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7158B |
2018-02-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7158A |
2018-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09056 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7158b