NY S07159 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires specification between partial approval of medical claims or payments and full denial of medical claims or payments on written notices to an insurer or an organization or corporation licensed or certified.
Title
Requires specification between partial approval of medical claims or payments and full denial of medical claims or payments on written notices to an insurer or an organization or corporation licensed or certified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.811 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09085 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - referred to insurance