NY S07166 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.198
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the village of Phoenix to alienate and sell parklands at fair market value to the Phoenix Central School District with the understanding that such village shall dedicate an amount equal to or greater than the fair market value of such parklands being alienated to the acquisition of new parklands and/or improvements to existing parklands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the village of Phoenix to alienate and sell parklands at fair market value to the Phoenix Central School District with the understanding that such village shall dedicate an amount equal to or greater than the fair market value of such parklands being alienated to the acquisition of new parklands and/or improvements to existing parklands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.198
2018-08-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.411
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10030b
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2018-06-04SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 7166C
2018-05-16SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 7166B
2018-02-28SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 7166A
2018-02-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-02-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.398
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10030 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7166c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07166&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07166&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07166
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07166&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07166A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07166&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07166B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07166&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07166C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S7166#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S7166#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07166&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback