NY S07195 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to enacting the "women on corporate boards study", in relation to the effectiveness thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to enacting the "women on corporate boards study", in relation to the effectiveness thereof.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.17
2020-01-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-01-28Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-28Assemblypassed assembly
2020-01-28Assemblyordered to third reading cal.345
2020-01-28Assemblysubstituted for a8991
2020-01-23Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2020-01-23SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-01-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-01-13SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.119
2020-01-10SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08991 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - substituted by s7195

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback