NY S07207 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requirements for notice to local governments, community organizations and other interested parties of the potential for significant service reductions at certain state-operated hospitals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requirements for notice to local governments, community organizations and other interested parties of the potential for significant service reductions at certain state-operated hospitals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.318
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading cal.669
2018-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a9563a
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to mental health
2018-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-31Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1477
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES

Same As/Similar To

A09563 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - substituted by s7207

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback