NY S07228 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision, in consultation with the commissioner of motor vehicles and the federal bureau of prisons, to develop a program to provide an identification card to each inmate upon the release of such inmate from custody.
Title
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision, in consultation with the commissioner of motor vehicles and the federal bureau of prisons, to develop a program to provide an identification card to each inmate upon the release of such inmate from custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7228A |
2020-01-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A10698 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - referred to correction