NY S07234 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - PRINT NUMBER 7234A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - PRINT NUMBER 7234A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authorization of the county of Chemung to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes to November 30, 2023.
Title
Relates to extending the authorization of the county of Chemung to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes to November 30, 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7234A |
2020-03-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09811 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - print number 9811a