NY S07236 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to five-year capital plans for the state university of New York and the city university of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to five-year capital plans for the state university of New York and the city university of New York.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.319
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.252
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10631
2018-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-04-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-04-18Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-04-17Senate1ST REPORT CAL.800
2018-01-04SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A10631 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7236

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback