NY S07259 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.356
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.356
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the SUNY health science centers are included in the maintenance of effort provision pursuant to chapter 260 of the laws of 2011.
Title
Clarifies that the SUNY health science centers are included in the maintenance of effort provision pursuant to chapter 260 of the laws of 2011.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.356 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.251 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10620 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1109 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7259A |
2018-04-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10620 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7259a