NY S07262 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public utilities to submit emergency preparation plans to the public service commission on an annual basis; requires submission of reports after the restoration of service in an emergency; relates to vegetation management and communications during power outages; requires penalties to be used towards investments in improving storm restoration.
Title
Requires public utilities to submit emergency preparation plans to the public service commission on an annual basis; requires submission of reports after the restoration of service in an emergency; relates to vegetation management and communications during power outages; requires penalties to be used towards investments in improving storm restoration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7262A |
2018-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1291 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10140 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - referred to governmental operations