NY S07275 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.371
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.371
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that a county's purchase of certain goods shall be administered pursuant to policies and procedures adopted by the county governing board and developed in consultation with the commissioner of agriculture and markets.
Title
Requires that a county's purchase of certain goods shall be administered pursuant to policies and procedures adopted by the county governing board and developed in consultation with the commissioner of agriculture and markets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.371 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.752 |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | substituted for a8923 |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2018-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.3 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08923 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - substituted by s7275