NY S07299 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.378
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.378
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the empire state development corporation to administer several revolving loan fund (RLF) programs in a manner consistent with how the small business revolving loan fund is administered.
Title
Authorizes the empire state development corporation to administer several revolving loan fund (RLF) programs in a manner consistent with how the small business revolving loan fund is administered.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.378 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.879 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | substituted for a8935 |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | referred to small business |
2018-02-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.27 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08935 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - substituted by s7299