NY S07300 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the New York seafood marketing task force and relates to state agencies having seafood marketing roundtable meetings with relevant stakeholders.
Title
Relates to the New York seafood marketing task force and relates to state agencies having seafood marketing roundtable meetings with relevant stakeholders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.180 |
2018-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.803 |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | substituted for a8937 |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-02-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.28 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08937 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7300