NY S07304 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing membership on the public health and health planning council and directing the appointment of members representing particular areas of concern.
Title
Relates to increasing membership on the public health and health planning council and directing the appointment of members representing particular areas of concern.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | approval memo.35 |
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.326 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.423 |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7304 |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-02-26 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-02-26 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-02-20 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.411 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | reported |
2020-01-24 | Senate | referred to health |
2020-02-26 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9530 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.423 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09530 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - approval memo.35