NY S07335 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rescue inhaler treatment devices.
Title
Relates to rescue inhaler treatment devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to health |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.425 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10214 (Same As) 2020-03-24 - referred to health