NY S07342 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to changing the licensing requirement to allow drivers with valid driver's licenses from other states to act as a transportation network company driver in New York.
Title
Relates to changing the licensing requirement to allow drivers with valid driver's licenses from other states to act as a transportation network company driver in New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.767 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7342A |
2018-02-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |