NY S07350 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to small business
Pending: Assembly Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs empire state development to publish and maintain a list of available programs to assist small businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs empire state development to publish and maintain a list of available programs to assist small businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10Assemblyreferred to small business
2020-03-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-03-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-02-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-02-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.481
2020-01-21SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A10119 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - referred to small business

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback