NY S07355 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the secretary of state to provide information to certain new businesses.
Title
Directs the secretary of state to provide information to certain new businesses.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | AMENDED 7355A |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.512 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10123 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions