NY S07388 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8684B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8684B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the presence of a companion animal when executing a warrant for eviction or dispossession of property and directs the executing officer to make arrangements for the safe removal of such animal.
Title
Relates to the presence of a companion animal when executing a warrant for eviction or dispossession of property and directs the executing officer to make arrangements for the safe removal of such animal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8684B |
2018-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7388B |
2018-02-27 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7388A |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.354 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08684 (Same As) 2018-08-23 - signed chap.205