NY S07398 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.436
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a minimum of 36 hours of mandatory continuing education for psychologists to be completed every 3 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a minimum of 36 hours of mandatory continuing education for psychologists to be completed every 3 years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.436
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-11Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.53
2018-06-11Assemblysubstituted for a9072a
2018-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1645
2018-06-07SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-15SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-02-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 7398A
2018-02-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2018-01-12SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A09072 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7398a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07398&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07398&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07398
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07398&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07398A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S7398#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S7398#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S7398#SC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07398&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback