NY S07399 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.437
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the village of Lynbrook to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Ronald J. Fleury who is employed by such village.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the village of Lynbrook to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Ronald J. Fleury who is employed by such village.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.437
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.54
2018-06-11Assemblysubstituted for a9580a
2018-05-16Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-05-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-16SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2018-04-23SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 7399A
2018-04-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-04-17Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-04-16Senate1ST REPORT CAL.746
2018-01-12SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A09580 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7399a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback