NY S07419 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - SIGNED CHAP.112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - SIGNED CHAP.112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the city of Yonkers occupancy tax.
Title
Extends the city of Yonkers occupancy tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.112 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.1055 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10529 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1552 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09600 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
A10529 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7419
A10529 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7419