NY S07439 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.181
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.181
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows out of state health care professionals to perform services at the Ironman Lake Placid and the Ironman 70.3.
Title
Allows out of state health care professionals to perform services at the Ironman Lake Placid and the Ironman 70.3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.181 |
2018-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.325 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9570a |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7439A |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.379 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09570 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7439a