NY S07475 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions of Jonathan's law.
Title
Extends certain provisions of Jonathan's law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.498 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.580 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a9777a |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2012-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7475A |
2012-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.963 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09777 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7475a