NY S07501 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - SIGNED CHAP.51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - SIGNED CHAP.51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Legislature and Judiciary Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Legislature and Judiciary Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-04-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.51 |
2020-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.16 |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | substituted for a9501 |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-04-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-04-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09501 (Same As) 2020-04-15 - SIGNED CHAP.51