NY S07502 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - SIGNED CHAP.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - SIGNED CHAP.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Debt Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Debt Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.52 |
2020-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-03-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-03-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.15 |
2020-03-31 | Assembly | substituted for a9502 |
2020-03-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.617 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09502 (Same As) 2020-04-15 - SIGNED CHAP.52