NY S07525 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to death benefits for certain members under the jurisdiction of the department of corrections and community supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to death benefits for certain members under the jurisdiction of the department of corrections and community supervision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.320
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.410
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10015
2018-06-04Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1513
2018-06-04SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-02-27SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-19SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10015 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7525

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback