NY S07589 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - approval memo.12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - approval memo.12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of fire prevention and control within the division of homeland security and emergency services to form a task force and issue a report relating to volunteer firefighter recruitment and retention; creates the New York state volunteer firefighter recruitment and retention task force; requires a report to the governor and legislature on Firefighter 1 training, and all other firefighter training offered by the office of fire prevention and control, and delivery methods to enhance and streamline training including the use of distance learning; the utilization of community colleges, BOCES or state accredited high schools to train firefighters and the creation of pilot programs within community colleges or BOCES that will offer Firefighter 1 certification upon completion; the creation of a dedicated bureau within the office of fire prevention and control responsible for recruitment and retention of volunteer firefighters; tax incentives and volunteer firefighter benefits currently provided and recommendations as to these or new programs; analysis of current recruitment and retention programs successfully being utilized by other states and recommendations as to adoption of similar programs in New York; and identification and recruitment incentives to assist in the recruitment of volunteer firefighters from under-represented and at-risk populations; makes related provisions.
Title
Directs the office of fire prevention and control within the division of homeland security and emergency services to form a task force and issue a report relating to volunteer firefighter recruitment and retention; creates the New York state volunteer firefighter recruitment and retention task force; requires a report to the governor and legislature on Firefighter 1 training, and all other firefighter training offered by the office of fire prevention and control, and delivery methods to enhance and streamline training including the use of distance learning; the utilization of community colleges, BOCES or state accredited high schools to train firefighters and the creation of pilot programs within community colleges or BOCES that will offer Firefighter 1 certification upon completion; the creation of a dedicated bureau within the office of fire prevention and control responsible for recruitment and retention of volunteer firefighters; tax incentives and volunteer firefighter benefits currently provided and recommendations as to these or new programs; analysis of current recruitment and retention programs successfully being utilized by other states and recommendations as to adoption of similar programs in New York; and identification and recruitment incentives to assist in the recruitment of volunteer firefighters from under-represented and at-risk populations; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | approval memo.12 |
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.258 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.820 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7589B |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.255 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | rules report cal.255 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-08 | Senate | print number 9779a |
2020-07-08 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2020-02-11 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9779A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.820 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7589B |
2020-07-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-07-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7589A |
2020-07-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09779 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - approval memo.12