NY S07614 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the instilling of mydriatic or cycloplegic eye drops by persons qualified and supervised by a licensed optometrist or ophthalmologist.
Title
Relates to the instilling of mydriatic or cycloplegic eye drops by persons qualified and supervised by a licensed optometrist or ophthalmologist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.971 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10209 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - referred to higher education