NY S07630 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9837A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9837A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the implementation of an electronic death registration system; provides that a payment shall be collected for each burial or removal permit issued electronically.
Title
Relates to the implementation of an electronic death registration system; provides that a payment shall be collected for each burial or removal permit issued electronically.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9837A |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1499 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7630A |
2018-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09837 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES