NY S07702 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes all school districts to establish insurance reserve funds.
Title
Authorizes all school districts to establish insurance reserve funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7702A |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.570 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10145 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - print number 10145a