NY S07706 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.586
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.586
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the application of provisions regulating insurance on wireless communications equipment.
Title
Expands the application of provisions regulating insurance on wireless communications equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.586 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.511 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10062 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1501 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10062 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7706