NY S07711 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-24 - PRINT NUMBER 7711B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-24 - PRINT NUMBER 7711B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of dogs and cats by retail pet shops; authorizes collaboration with entities to provide space to showcase cats or dogs owned by certain entities for the purpose of adoption.
Title
Prohibits the sale of dogs and cats by retail pet shops; authorizes collaboration with entities to provide space to showcase cats or dogs owned by certain entities for the purpose of adoption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7711B |
2018-08-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-03-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7711A |
2018-03-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09946 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - print number 9946a