NY S07712 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates state route 256 in the town of Conesus, county of Livingston, as the "Conesus Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates state route 256 in the town of Conesus, county of Livingston, as the "Conesus Veterans Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.317 |
2018-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.333 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9856 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1579 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09856 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7712