NY S07731 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.343
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of New Castle, in the county of Westchester, to lease space on the sport field fences in 3 of its parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of New Castle, in the county of Westchester, to lease space on the sport field fences in 3 of its parks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05AssemblySIGNED CHAP.343
2018-10-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.332
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a9821a
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1580
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-04-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 7731A
2018-04-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-02-14SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A09821 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7731a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback